Financial history ISRAELI SCOUTS WESTERN EUROPE

Charity number: 1156815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £400.83k £319.39k £343.69k £336.07k £249.66k
Total expenditure £365.98k £313.80k £319.06k £301.42k £191.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A