Trustees ISRAELI SCOUTS WESTERN EUROPE

Charity number: 1156815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SCOTT ANTONY SAUNDERS Chair 12 March 2014
MARCH OF THE LIVING (UK) LIMITED
Received: On time
Eran Benyanimi Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Elad Sanderovich Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Carlo Cali Cohen Trustee 13 January 2016
None on record
HARRY JONATHAN DANIEL Trustee 05 August 2015
HABAID
Received: On time
MANUELA LEA RATHAUS-ALPER Trustee 12 March 2014
None on record