GREENFIELD SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity number: 504518
Charity reporting is overdue by 615 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2014 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018
Total gross income £3.30k £3.11k £3.33k £2.86k £1.77k
Total expenditure £3.47k £3.97k £3.17k £3.08k £1.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A