Accounts and annual returns THE ST PAUL'S OLD SCHOOL TRUST (CHELTENHAM)

Charity number: 1155798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required