Financial history THE ST PAUL'S OLD SCHOOL TRUST (CHELTENHAM)

Charity number: 1155798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13.46k £20.35k £21.01k £16.63k £15.44k
Total expenditure £21.65k £16.39k £20.04k £13.60k £13.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A