Trustees SOUTHERN BROOKS COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIPS

Charity number: 1157061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
juliet moore Chair 19 July 2017
None on record
Philip James Grew Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Dr Karen Jayne Rochester Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
Chris Walker Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record
Paul Timmins Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
Harry Partington Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
Andrew James Bell Trustee 27 June 2018
BRENTRY AND HENBURY CHILDRENS CENTRE LIMITED
Received: 3 days late
margaret slucutt Trustee 25 January 2017
SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE OVER 50'S FORUM
Recently registered
DAVID BELL Trustee 13 February 2014
None on record