Financial history PITSMOOR ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND

Charity number: 1156611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £150.84k £143.13k £149.78k £215.25k £171.11k
Total expenditure £132.58k £126.50k £169.96k £169.58k £192.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £18.43k N/A
Income from government grants £8.83k £6.60k N/A N/A £22.85k