THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BECONTREE

Charity number: 1157461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 June 2017 On time Download