HURSTBOURNE TARRANT COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1156307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 09 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 15 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 15 November 2016 On time Download