OTTERBOURNE BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of brass band music, in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit including through the presentation of public concerts, recitals and competitions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 June 2014: Standard registration
- NONE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Magor | Chair | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Ursula Colley | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Rayner | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue McAsey | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANTHONY | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET JANE CONDE | Trustee | 02 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.32k | £5.65k | £4.93k | £6.77k | £8.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.53k | £5.45k | £5.07k | £9.81k | £11.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/01/2014 AS AMENDED ON 01/05/2014
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE,IMPROVE,DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF BRASS BAND MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT,INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS,RECITALS AND COMPETITIONS.2.TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 MERDON AVENUE
CHANDLER'S FORD
EASTLEIGH
SO53 1EP
- Phone:
- 02380253960
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
otterbournebrass.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window