Accounts and annual returns RUTLAND MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1156103
Charity reporting is overdue by 356 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 August 2020 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window