EMPIRE FIGHTING CHANCE

Charity number: 1156690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £647.00k £178.42k £497.93k £770.57k £805.54k
Total expenditure £606.53k £164.54k £297.67k £575.75k £749.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £120.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.61k N/A N/A £660.85k £657.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £642.39k N/A N/A £89.74k £135.44k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £19.98k £12.45k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £605.96k N/A N/A £523.02k £683.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £52.74k £66.06k
Expenditure - Governance £576 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0