Financial history THE ELLA ROBERTA FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.09k £5.88k £4.73k £9.46k £36.36k
Total expenditure £6.32k £9.43k £7.52k £7.59k £9.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A