Trustees THE ELLA ROBERTA FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158212
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREA ELIZABETH CAREY FULLER Chair 15 December 2021
None on record
Barbara Gray Trustee 13 July 2022
None on record
Rosamund Adoo-Kissi-Debrah Trustee 30 March 2022
None on record
Jennifer Joy Davis Trustee 15 December 2021
THE WEST END COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Joseph Taylor Trustee 05 February 2019
None on record
SHARON FARNLEY Trustee 09 March 2015
None on record