HADE EDGE ACADEMY OF MUSIC

Charity number: 1156145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 29 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 03 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 08 November 2018 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 08 November 2018 39 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 25 September 2017 On time Download