OCEANS PROJECT

Charity number: 1156583
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 November 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

( These accounts
have been qualified)

25 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)