HOWICK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1156634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 04 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 05 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required