Financial history INTERNATIONAL EGG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £274.57k £299.09k £451.24k £322.24k £239.97k
Total expenditure £249.58k £314.31k £451.69k £320.53k £219.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A