ABERAERON SECONDARY SCHOOL DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL AND RECREATIONAL PROJECT

Charity number: 504551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 August 2016 On time Download