ABERAERON SECONDARY SCHOOL DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL AND RECREATIONAL PROJECT

Charity number: 504551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £148.53k £140.05k £121.15k £123.64k £126.20k
Total expenditure £123.85k £142.89k £140.10k £123.20k £132.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £61.21k £53.34k £48.35k £47.39k £43.46k