Financial history CHEADLE & DISTRICT FOODBANK

Charity number: 1156477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.86k £5.63k £4.48k £14.84k £7.66k
Total expenditure £3.20k £3.30k £3.17k £3.52k £5.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £500 N/A N/A