Trustees CHEADLE & DISTRICT FOODBANK

Charity number: 1156477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Diane Margaret White Chair 22 March 2016
None on record
Andrew Carter Trustee 06 July 2022
None on record
Dorothy-Ann Amelia Sherratt Trustee 19 April 2022
None on record
Robert Sunderland Trustee 23 February 2021
None on record
Heather Margaret Bates Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record