THE DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY CATHOLIC HANDICAPPED CHILDREN'S FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 504555
Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 310 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 310 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 676 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 676 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1041 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1041 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1406 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1406 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1771 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1771 days