THE DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY CATHOLIC HANDICAPPED CHILDREN'S FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 504555
Charity reporting is overdue by 1769 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £20 £4.02k £257 £6.53k £2.51k
Total expenditure £1.03k £230 £4.79k £5.63k £2.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A