Governing document WARWICKSHIRE CONSTABULARY BENEVOLENT FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 1975,13 OCTOBER 1986,5 OCTOBER 1993 AND 3 OCTOBER 1996.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ASSIST BY MONETARY GRANTS SUCH MEMBERS OF THE FUND AND THEIR WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS AND IMEDIATE DEPENDATNS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS OR IMPOVERISHED CIRCUMSTANCES. (B) TO MAKD LOANS TO SUBSCRIBING MEMBERS OF THE FUND IN NECESSITOUS CIRMCUMSTANCES. (C) TO MAKE GRANTS TO POLICE CHARITIES, OR OTHER CHARITABLE FUNDS, OR GRANTS TO SUCH PERSONS WO ARE IN NECESSITOUS OR IMPROVERISHED CIRMCUMTANCES AS THE COMMITTEE MAY SELECT. (D) TO MAKE GRANTS TO MEMBERS ATTENDING A POLICE CONVALESCENCE, IN ORDER TO ASSIST WITH THEIR TRAVEL AND INCIDENTAL EXPENDITURE DURING THEIR STAY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.