ARYA SAMAJ(VEDIC MISSION) WEST MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. WEEKLY CONGREGATIONS/PRAYERS. 2. DAILY PRAYER. 3. WEEKLY FRIENDS GROUP GATHERINGS FOR ALL AGES/GENDRES AND RACES. 4. FREE YOGA/MEDITATION AND AASANA (POSTURES) SESSIONS TO HELP STAY ACTIVE & HEALTHY. 5. CHILDRENS' DANCE CLASSES TO ENHANCE COMMUNITY SPIRIT AND KEEP AWAY FROM STREET MENACE. 6. NATIONAL, CULTURAL AND COMMUNITY FESTIVALS/ EVENTS. 7. BEREAVEMENT COUNCELLING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 23 April 2014: CIO registration
- 20 May 2014: Funds received from 506019 ARYA SAMAJ (VEDIC MISSION) WEST MIDLANDS
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ravinder Renukunta | Chair | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bimla Saund | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vijay Kumar | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vinod Gulati | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.55k | £41.41k | £33.57k | £47.76k | £47.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.44k | £29.53k | £33.29k | £48.34k | £47.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 05 DEC 2018 as amended on 16 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE VEDIC DHARMA (RELIGION) AND TO PROMOTE THE CULTURAL, SPIRITUAL AND EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Arya Samaj (Vedic Mission) West Mid
321 Rookery Road
Handsworth
Birmingham
B21 9PR
- Phone:
- 01213597727
- Email:
- enquiries@arya-samaj.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window