Accounts and annual returns EQUIPAFRICA CHARTIABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1157689

Charity reporting is overdue by 401 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 36 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 36 days | |
Annual return | 19 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 401 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 401 days | |
Annual return | 19 October 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 October 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 October 2018 | 27 October 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2018 | 27 October 2018 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window