EQUIPAFRICA CHARTIABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1157689
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 19/10/2016 19/10/2017 19/10/2018 19/10/2019 19/10/2020
Total gross income £959 £5.44k £957 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.09k £4.80k £0 £0 £1.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A