WOODLAND ROAD COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1158191
Charity reporting is overdue by 1403 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1038 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1038 days
Annual return 05 April 2017 06 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1403 days
Annual return 05 April 2016 06 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 09 March 2017 32 days late Download