TAVISTOCK SWIMMING CLUB (EST. 1990)

Charity number: 1157854
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 £2.00k £1.40k N/A
Other income £69.24k £70.92k £76.09k £84.25k £81.61k
Total expenditure £63.16k £68.80k £76.17k £88.02k £79.11k