TAVISTOCK SWIMMING CLUB (EST. 1990)

Charity number: 1157854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Holly Palmer Trustee 25 June 2017 None on record
LISA JANE FRANCE Trustee 27 February 2014 None on record
Liam Sebag-Montefiore Trustee 12 March 2020 None on record
Katrina Shipp Trustee 23 June 2019 None on record
Samantha Lake BA MED Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Paul Johnson Chair 25 June 2017 None on record
Caroline Furze Trustee 25 June 2017 None on record
Dawn Gatcum Trustee 23 June 2019 None on record
Hazel Walker Trustee 25 June 2017 None on record
Sarah Rice Trustee 03 June 2018 None on record