Financial history TOWNER

Charity number: 1156762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.83m £2.74m £1.67m £2.11m £1.86m
Total expenditure £1.42m £1.59m £1.44m £1.85m £1.34m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £974.46k £613.88k £413.88k £419.88k £1.16m
Income - Donations and legacies £162.65k £2.47m £644.29k £497.13k £604.29k
Income - Other trading activities £84.98k £267.45k £50.73k £514.00k £397.61k
Income - Charitable activities £1.08m £469 £974.59k £1.10m £862.40k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.56m £1.44m £1.04m £805.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.94k £0 £0 £145.07k £132.85k
Expenditure - Governance £29.65k £19.70k £7.15k £27.07k £32.27k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £18.90k £30.83k £0 £660.03k £397.61k