BROADFIELD YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1156601
Charity reporting is 31 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not yet received
31 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not yet received
31 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 September 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)