1ST ACOMB (YORK) BOYS' BRIGADE

Charity number: 1157897
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 24 September 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)