1ST ACOMB (YORK) BOYS' BRIGADE

Charity number: 1157897
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £22.85k £21.08k £12.85k £12.61k £20.81k
Total expenditure £31.57k £17.81k £11.75k £13.75k £20.39k