AL HIKMAH LEARNING CENTRE

Charity number: 1157165
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 10 May 2021 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 10 May 2021 98 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 18 February 2021 383 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 18 February 2021 383 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 14 February 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 14 February 2019 13 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 27 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 01 March 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 01 March 2017 28 days late Download