THE BOBBY DORKA FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1156359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download