Financial history ST ANDREWS CHURCH, DEVIZES

Charity number: 1156418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £78.71k £68.78k £78.49k £56.25k £49.44k
Total expenditure £76.60k £64.83k £80.14k £71.43k £60.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A