Trustees ST ANDREWS CHURCH, DEVIZES

Charity number: 1156418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV GARY JOHN GOTHAM Chair 24 March 2014
None on record
Jean Green Trustee 21 May 2022
None on record
JANINE MARGARET FANSHAWE Trustee 19 September 2021
GREAT CHEVERELL VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Rosemary Stevens Trustee 19 September 2021
None on record
Ruth Marjorie McGregor Trustee 18 May 2019
None on record
PATRICIA MARIE LEE Trustee 12 May 2018
None on record
MARION ANN BUTLER Trustee 21 May 2017
None on record