TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (SHREWSBURY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our key activities are: Running introductory courses on meditation and buddhism Running a weekly class to help regular group members deepen their understanding and practice of meditation, ethics and Dharma (the teachings of the Buddha) Providing opportunities for group-based study of the Dharma Supporting people to train for ordination in the Triratna Buddhist Order
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 24 July 2014: CIO registration
- SHREWSBURY TRIRATNA BUDDHIST GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Bruton | Chair | 06 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Fay Pritchard | Trustee | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sioned Wynn Prabhakari | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Daley | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Abhayanara Crosskey | Trustee | 17 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.86k | £26.67k | £32.94k | £35.29k | £45.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.00k | £28.09k | £27.62k | £14.47k | £26.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) ENCOURAGING MEMBERS AND OTHERS TO LIVE ETHICAL LIVES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA; (2) SUPPORTING ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY AND OTHER DULY ORDAINED BUDDHISTS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE CIO; (3) MAINTAINING CLOSE COMMUNICATION WITH AND WORKING UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OBJECTS; AND (4) USING APPLICATIONS OF THE BUDDHA'S TEACHING TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF ALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Darwin Street
Shrewsbury
SY3 8QE
- Phone:
- 07528369502
- Email:
- akasaraja@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window