GODIVA GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 April 2014: CIO registration
- GODIVA PRE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mumtaz Begum | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mehnaz Khan | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.13k | £8.44k | £24.85k | £24.95k | £24.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.11k | £8.89k | £15.80k | £15.80k | £15.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Apr 2014 as amended on 29 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; 2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; 3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; 4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; 5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; 6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE; AND 7) THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE BUILDING KNOWN AS ‘THE OLD LIBRARY’ AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE HISTORICAL MERIT OF THE PROPERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 1
Givens House
Thomas Street
Coventry
CV1 3HL
- Phone:
- 07310901915
- Email:
- Godivagroup@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
under.reconstruction
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window