Trustees THE CHANCTONBURY COMMUNITY PLAY SCHEME CIO
Charity number: 1158377

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER WOODCOCK | Chair | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Woodcock | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Halliwell | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Polly Herron | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lara Cloake | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Spinks | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hoddy | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Prince-Beldam | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WOODCOCK | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN JOHNSON MBE | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.