NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR OSTEOPATHIC RESEARCH

Charity number: 1157217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 03 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 22 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 29 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 05 December 2016 On time Download