NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR OSTEOPATHIC RESEARCH

Charity number: 1157217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £132.61k £131.93k £80.63k £87.79k £83.38k
Total expenditure £87.92k £77.47k £77.99k £107.57k £112.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A