JAMIA MASJID HAROONIA NISBAT-E-RASOOLI AND MUSLIM TEACHING CENTRE

Charity number: 1156213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £83.73k £77.93k £109.21k £101.13k £99.39k
Total expenditure £59.48k £71.96k £61.01k £55.05k £57.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A