PENSILVA YOUTH PROJECTS

Charity number: 1157352
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 April 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 08 April 2021 62 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 08 April 2021 428 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 08 April 2021 428 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 April 2021 793 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 08 April 2021 793 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 08 April 2021 1158 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 08 April 2021 1158 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 12 May 2017 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 12 May 2017 96 days late Download