Financial history WOMEN ASYLUM SEEKERS TOGETHER

Charity number: 1158551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £57.82k £73.43k £75.04k £116.16k £127.37k
Total expenditure £50.95k £60.87k £82.79k £99.89k £92.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A