Financial history MUNTADA AID

Charity number: 1157117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.05m £2.65m £2.42m £1.51m £1.43m
Total expenditure £2.14m £2.79m £2.30m £1.39m £1.30m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.09m £2.65m £2.13m £1.51m £1.36m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £2.03m £120.75k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £286.55k £0 £70.47k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.39m £1.88m £1.87m £1.18m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £568.22k £343.20k £434.38k £215.78k £193.92k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £15.73k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £49.28k £24.15k £0
Expenditure - Other £187.91k £571.51k £0 £0 £0