ARMADA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kitesurfing and SUP Charity fundraising events which raise funds for youth and rescue service charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 01 August 2014: Standard registration
- 12 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KITESURFING ARMADA (Previous name)
- KITESURFING ARMADA TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £667 | £5.39k | £26.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £9.74k | £14.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 12 June 2019 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 12 June 2019 | 132 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAR 2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/01/2015
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window