Financial history ST JAMES PRE-SCHOOL WOOLTON

Charity number: 1160217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £117.61k £117.05k £118.54k £91.00k £108.28k
Total expenditure £119.12k £128.75k £119.48k £93.42k £102.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £74.51k £71.44k £96.85k £63.71k £81.68k